Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/24/2004