Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/22/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/22/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/22/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/28/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/28/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/28/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/04/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/05/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 05/05/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/05/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/05/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/18/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/09/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/09/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/14/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/08/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/07/2004