Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/21/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 04/21/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/22/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/22/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/22/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/22/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/22/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/22/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/28/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/28/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/28/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/06/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/06/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/06/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/17/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/17/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/17/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/17/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/03/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/03/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/03/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/25/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/15/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/20/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/07/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/07/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/07/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/07/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/07/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/07/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/07/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/07/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/07/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/15/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/15/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/22/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/08/2004