Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/30/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/06/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/06/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/12/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/12/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 05/20/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/09/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/09/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/09/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/09/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/25/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/25/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/15/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/15/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/15/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/30/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/30/2004