Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/23/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/21/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/21/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/21/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/21/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 04/21/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/21/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/21/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/21/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/21/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/21/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/21/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/22/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/22/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/04/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/04/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/04/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/04/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/09/2004