Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/11/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/31/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/11/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/28/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/16/2004