Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/28/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/28/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/28/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/28/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/05/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/25/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/14/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/04/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/22/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/20/2004