Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/09/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/10/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/10/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/16/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/16/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/16/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/16/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/17/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/17/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/17/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/24/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/24/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/24/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/31/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/31/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/31/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/20/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/14/2004