Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/27/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 01/27/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/05/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/05/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/12/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/12/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/25/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/04/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/04/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/04/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/12/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/12/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/31/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/07/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/12/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/13/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/20/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/20/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/04/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/04/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/04/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/09/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/09/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/19/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/09/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/15/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/04/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/04/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/09/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/17/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/17/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/21/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 11/17/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 12/08/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/11/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/18/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/08/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/08/2004
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/06/2004