Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/25/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/25/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/25/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/25/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 02/25/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/25/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/11/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/12/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/17/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/20/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/01/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/01/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/03/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/08/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/14/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/16/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/21/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/22/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/22/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/22/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/22/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/22/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/22/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/22/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/22/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/22/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/22/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/22/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/22/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/22/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/22/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/22/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/22/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/22/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/22/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/22/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/22/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/22/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/22/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/22/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/22/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/22/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/22/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/22/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/22/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/22/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/22/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/22/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/22/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/22/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/22/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/22/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/22/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/22/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/22/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/22/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/22/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/22/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/22/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/22/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/23/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/24/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/24/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/24/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/24/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/24/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/24/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/24/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/24/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/24/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/24/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/24/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/24/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/24/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/24/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/24/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/24/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/24/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/06/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/06/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/09/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/09/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/09/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/09/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/09/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/09/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/12/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/19/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/19/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/21/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/15/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/15/2004