Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/25/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/25/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 03/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/02/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/02/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/02/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/02/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/02/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/09/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/09/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/09/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/09/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/09/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/09/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/09/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/11/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/11/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/11/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/16/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/18/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/18/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/24/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/30/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 03/30/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/30/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/30/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/31/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/31/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/31/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/31/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/31/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/01/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/01/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/01/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/02/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/02/2004