Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/11/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/18/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/30/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/30/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/17/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/24/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/24/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/24/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/07/2004