Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/03/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/03/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/03/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/03/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/10/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/10/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/10/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/16/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/31/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/01/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/01/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/02/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/02/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/02/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/02/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/02/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/02/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/02/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/02/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/20/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/21/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/22/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/06/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew