Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/04/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/10/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/10/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/10/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/10/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/10/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/10/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/09/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/09/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/24/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/24/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/14/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/14/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/15/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/15/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/21/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/21/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/21/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/21/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/21/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/08/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/13/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/13/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/30/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/09/2004