Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 01/20/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/20/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 01/20/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/20/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/03/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/03/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/03/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/03/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/03/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/03/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/04/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/04/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/04/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/04/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/04/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/04/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/04/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/04/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/04/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/04/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/04/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/04/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/04/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/04/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/04/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/04/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/04/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/04/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/04/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/04/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/04/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/04/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/10/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/10/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/10/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/10/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/10/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/10/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/10/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/10/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/10/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/11/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/11/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/11/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/11/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/11/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/11/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/11/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/25/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/25/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/25/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/25/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/25/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/25/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/03/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/03/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/17/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/17/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/17/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/17/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/17/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/02/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/21/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/21/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/12/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/12/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/12/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/12/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/12/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/12/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/17/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/17/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/17/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/17/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/17/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/17/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/25/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/25/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/25/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/2004