Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/08/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/20/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/20/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/21/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 01/28/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/11/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/25/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/25/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/03/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 03/12/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/23/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/13/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/13/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/01/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/24/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/19/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/19/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/08/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/07/2004