Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/24/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/21/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/24/2004