Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/27/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/29/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/29/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/29/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/29/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 01/29/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/29/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 01/29/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/29/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/29/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/29/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/29/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/29/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/05/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/05/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/05/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/05/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/13/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/13/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/13/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/13/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/13/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/13/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/13/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/27/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/27/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/05/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/02/2003