Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/25/2004
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 06/02/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/02/2004