Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 11/20/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/23/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/01/2004