Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/05/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/18/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/18/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/19/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/19/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/02/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 03/02/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/02/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/03/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/03/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/03/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/03/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/03/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/10/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/10/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/10/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/16/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/16/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/16/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/16/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/16/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/17/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/18/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/18/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/18/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/18/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/23/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/23/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/23/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/23/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/24/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/24/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/24/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/25/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/25/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/30/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/30/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/30/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/30/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/30/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/02/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/12/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/12/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/19/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/16/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/16/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/16/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/09/2004