Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/10/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/10/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/10/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/10/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/10/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/10/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/10/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/10/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 11/21/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/21/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/08/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/27/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/27/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/27/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/04/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/24/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/03/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/03/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/16/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/25/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/25/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/25/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/25/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/02/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/02/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/03/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/03/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/03/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/03/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/03/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/03/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/03/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/09/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/20/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/23/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/08/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/17/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/17/2004