Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/16/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/16/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/21/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/21/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/21/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/28/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/29/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/18/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/18/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/23/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/23/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/23/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/10/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/02/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/29/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/30/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/03/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/03/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/08/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/08/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/09/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/09/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/18/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/18/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/18/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/18/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/18/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/18/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/18/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/18/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/18/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/18/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/18/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/18/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/18/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/18/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/18/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/18/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/18/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/18/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/18/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/18/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/18/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/18/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/18/2004
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/18/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/18/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/21/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/21/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/21/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/21/2004