Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/28/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/28/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/28/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/06/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/06/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/06/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/03/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/03/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/04/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/04/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/04/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 03/09/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/16/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/16/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/16/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/30/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/30/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/01/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/27/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/12/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/01/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/01/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 06/22/2004