Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/08/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/21/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/26/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew