Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 09/25/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 01/20/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/20/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/02/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/31/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/31/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/13/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/13/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/19/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/16/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 06/16/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/16/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/17/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/17/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/17/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/17/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/09/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/05/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/08/2004