Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/25/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 09/04/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/19/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/19/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/09/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/16/2004