Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/25/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/08/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/12/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/12/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/12/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/17/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/17/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/17/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/20/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/02/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/02/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/02/2004
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/02/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 06/02/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/02/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/04/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/04/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/04/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/04/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/15/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/16/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/16/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/22/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/15/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/20/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/22/2004
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/23/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/30/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/07/2004