Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/08/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 10/16/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/05/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/17/2004