Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/25/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/09/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/09/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/09/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/10/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/23/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/23/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/02/2003