Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/25/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/23/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/07/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/07/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/16/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/29/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/19/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/10/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/10/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/05/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/05/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/19/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/19/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/19/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/19/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/19/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/19/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/19/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/08/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/08/2004