Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/21/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/24/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/25/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/25/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/25/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/25/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/04/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/30/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/11/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/11/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/11/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/07/2004