Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/31/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/31/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/30/2003