Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 07/15/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/15/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/15/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/15/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 07/15/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/21/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/23/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/23/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/16/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 10/16/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/16/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/18/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/18/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 02/04/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/04/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/26/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/26/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/24/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/02/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/02/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/22/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/13/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/15/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/15/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/15/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/15/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/15/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/23/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/23/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/15/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/22/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/08/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/08/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/21/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/07/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/07/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/18/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew