Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/16/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/22/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/03/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/03/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/03/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/03/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/03/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/10/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/10/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/10/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/10/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/10/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/16/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/16/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/25/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 09/25/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/30/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/07/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/14/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/14/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/04/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/21/2004