Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/16/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 07/16/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/17/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/18/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/21/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/23/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/23/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/03/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/03/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/03/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/05/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/05/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/17/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/24/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/24/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/02/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/07/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/07/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/08/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/15/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/28/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/28/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/29/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/04/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/17/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/17/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/17/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/18/2004