Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/22/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/22/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/22/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/22/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/23/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 07/23/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/23/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/10/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/10/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/23/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/23/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/24/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/24/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/02/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/17/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 10/17/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/28/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 11/06/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/06/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/26/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/26/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/02/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/02/2004
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/09/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/17/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/17/2004
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/17/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/17/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 03/17/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 03/25/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/25/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/25/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/25/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/25/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/25/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/25/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/25/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/25/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/25/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/30/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/30/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/30/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/30/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/30/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 04/01/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/01/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/01/2004
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/22/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/13/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/13/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/19/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/19/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 05/19/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/19/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/02/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/02/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/02/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/08/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/08/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/15/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/15/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/15/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/15/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/15/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/23/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/23/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/14/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/23/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/30/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/30/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/30/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/30/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/08/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/08/2004