Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/09/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/09/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/09/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/09/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/18/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/18/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 07/18/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/18/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/23/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/23/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/03/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/03/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/04/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/09/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/23/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 10/20/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/29/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/18/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/20/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/10/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/10/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/02/2004