Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/18/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/18/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/18/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/19/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/19/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/19/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/19/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/19/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/19/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/08/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/08/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/08/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/08/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/10/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/10/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/10/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 07/10/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/17/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/17/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/22/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/22/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/25/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/01/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/08/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/24/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/18/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/18/2003