There is one summary for this bill. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2003)

Amends the Small Webcaster Settlement Act of 2002 to extend from June 20, 2003, until June 20, 2004, suspension of all payments by noncommercial webcasters under Federal copyright law which have not already been paid for the digital performance of sound recordings and the making of ephemeral phonorecords during the period from October 28, 1998, to May 31, 2003.

Amends Federal copyright law to extend from May 31, 2003, until May 31, 2004, the authority of noncommercial webcasters to enter into settlement agreements (including royalty terms) for the reproduction and performance of sound recordings during the period from October 28, 1998, to December 31, 2004.