Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/09/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/09/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/09/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/23/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/23/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/25/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/10/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/11/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/15/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/22/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/15/2003