Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/21/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/21/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/21/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/21/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/21/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/21/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/11/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/26/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/02/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/07/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew