Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/08/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/09/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/09/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/09/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/09/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/09/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/14/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/14/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/14/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/14/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/02/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/04/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/09/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/10/2003