Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/11/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/05/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/19/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/27/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/10/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/10/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew