Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 01/08/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/28/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/28/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/28/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/28/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/28/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 01/28/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/04/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/04/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/04/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/04/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/04/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/05/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/05/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/05/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/05/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 02/05/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/11/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/11/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/11/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/11/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/11/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/11/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/12/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/12/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/13/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/05/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/05/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/05/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/05/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/05/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/11/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/11/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/12/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/12/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/12/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/17/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/17/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/17/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/17/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/17/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/17/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/19/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/19/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/20/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/24/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/24/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/24/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/24/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/24/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/24/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/25/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/25/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/25/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 03/25/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/25/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/27/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/27/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/27/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/27/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/31/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/31/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/02/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/02/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/02/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/02/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/02/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/03/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/08/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/10/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/10/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/10/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/01/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/09/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 05/14/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/17/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew