Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/09/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/10/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/11/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/17/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/19/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/07/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/16/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/17/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/17/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/21/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/04/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/11/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/17/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/17/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/17/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/17/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/17/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/23/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/23/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/23/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/23/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/30/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/07/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/07/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/08/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/14/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/15/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/17/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/17/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/09/2004