Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/01/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/01/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/06/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/13/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/19/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/03/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/03/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/05/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/05/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/11/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/19/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/02/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/08/2004