Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/20/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/24/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/23/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/27/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/10/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/03/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/10/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/06/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/14/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/22/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/14/2004