Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 05/01/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 05/01/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/01/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 05/09/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/14/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/14/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/14/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 05/14/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/14/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/14/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/14/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/15/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/15/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/15/2003