Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/03/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/30/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/07/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/07/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/07/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/20/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/20/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/21/2003